THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:25:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1995
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 888 Meadowlands Drive East
Ottawa Ontario K2C 3R2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 228-2882
Fax: (613) 228-2856

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Eric A. Clark Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jul 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Lim (CPSO#: 68861 ) Dr. E. Clark (CPSO#: 69269 )
Business Address: Ottawa Hospital General Site
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 730-5058
Business Address: Ottawa Civic Hospital
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
(613) 798-5555 Extn: 19002

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 888 Meadowlands Drive East
Ottawa Ontario K2C 3R2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 228-2882
Fax: (613) 228-2856

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Eric A. Clark Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jul 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Lim (CPSO#: 68861 ) Dr. E. Clark (CPSO#: 69269 )
Business Address: Ottawa Hospital General Site
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 730-5058
Business Address: Ottawa Civic Hospital
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
(613) 798-5555 Extn: 19002

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SEN-MEI LIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SEN-MEI LIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1997
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1997

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995