THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 05:06:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 102
6855 Meadowvale Town Centre Circle
Mississauga Ontario L5N 2Y1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 567-9911
Fax: (905) 567-9011

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kenny J. Zhang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jun 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Zhang (CPSO#: 68869 )
Business Address: 102 - 6855 Meadowvale Town Centre Circle
Mississauga Ontario L5N 2Y1
(905) 567-9911

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, MANDARIN
Medical School: Queen's University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 102
6855 Meadowvale Town Centre Circle
Mississauga Ontario L5N 2Y1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 567-9911
Fax: (905) 567-9011

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kenny J. Zhang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jun 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Zhang (CPSO#: 68869 )
Business Address: 102 - 6855 Meadowvale Town Centre Circle
Mississauga Ontario L5N 2Y1
(905) 567-9911

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KENNY JIAN ZHANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZHANG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KENNY JIAN ZHANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZHANG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1997
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 1997

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995