THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:49:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 865 Regent St
Unit M3-014
Sudbury ON P3E 3Y9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7055237253
Fax: 7055237263
Address: Health Sciences North
Paris Street
Sudbury Ontario P3E 3Y9
Phone: (705) 671-1000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 12 Sep 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 12 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brian Y.L. Wong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Apr 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Wong (CPSO#: 68870 )
Business Address: 865 Regent St
Unit M3-014
Sudbury ON P3E 3Y9
7055237253
Business Address: 865 Regent Street South
Suite 303
Sudbury Ontario P3E 3Y9
(705) 523-7253

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE
Medical School: Queen's University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 865 Regent St
Unit M3-014
Sudbury ON P3E 3Y9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7055237253
Fax: 7055237263
Address: Health Sciences North
Paris Street
Sudbury Ontario P3E 3Y9
Phone: (705) 671-1000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 12 Sep 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 12 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brian Y.L. Wong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Apr 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Wong (CPSO#: 68870 )
Business Address: 865 Regent St
Unit M3-014
Sudbury ON P3E 3Y9
7055237253
Business Address: 865 Regent Street South
Suite 303
Sudbury Ontario P3E 3Y9
(705) 523-7253

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRIAN YIN LOONG WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRIAN YIN LOONG WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 May 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1998
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 May 2001

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1998

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995