THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:52:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 107
121 Dundas Street East
Belleville Ontario K8N 1C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 961-7600
Fax: (613) 961-1377

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Quinte Health Belleville
HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paul J. Wilkins Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Aug 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Wilkins (CPSO#: 68872 )
Business Address: 121 Dundas Street East
Belleville Ontario K8N 1C3
(613) 961-7600

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 107
121 Dundas Street East
Belleville Ontario K8N 1C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 961-7600
Fax: (613) 961-1377

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Quinte Health Belleville
HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paul J. Wilkins Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Aug 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Wilkins (CPSO#: 68872 )
Business Address: 121 Dundas Street East
Belleville Ontario K8N 1C3
(613) 961-7600

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAUL JAMES WILKINS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILKINS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAUL JAMES WILKINS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILKINS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1997
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jun 1997

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995