THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:04:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4-181 Plains Rd W
Burlington ON L7T 0B1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055256000
Fax: 18665224588
Address: 4-181 Plains Rd W
Burlington ON L7T 0B1
Phone: 9055256000
Fax: 18665224588
Address: 100 West 5th Street
St joseph's healthcare hamilton
psychiatry
Orchard 1 unit
Hamilton Ontario L9C 3N7
Phone: 905 522 1155
Extension: 36400
Fax: 905 381 5621
Address: Central East Correctional Centre
516 County Road 36
Kawartha Lakes
Lindsay Ontario K9V 4S6
Phone: 705-328-6000
Fax: 705-328-6003
Address: Quinte Detention Centre
89 Richmond Blvd
Napanee Ontario K7R 3S1
Phone: 613 354 9701
Fax: 613 354 3944

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Nov 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Wesley Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Wesley (CPSO#: 68874 )
Business Address: Central East Correctional Centre
Ministry of Community Safety
and Correctional Services
541 Highway 36 P O Box 4500
Lindsay Ontario K9V 4S6
(705) 328-6000
Business Address: St. Joseph's Healthcare
Centre for Mountain Health Services
100 West 5th Street
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3K7
(905) 522-1155
Business Address: 4-181 Plains Rd W
4-181 Plains Rd W
Burlington ON L7T 0B1
9055256000

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4-181 Plains Rd W
Burlington ON L7T 0B1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055256000
Fax: 18665224588
Address: 4-181 Plains Rd W
Burlington ON L7T 0B1
Phone: 9055256000
Fax: 18665224588
Address: 100 West 5th Street
St joseph's healthcare hamilton
psychiatry
Orchard 1 unit
Hamilton Ontario L9C 3N7
Phone: 905 522 1155
Extension: 36400
Fax: 905 381 5621
Address: Central East Correctional Centre
516 County Road 36
Kawartha Lakes
Lindsay Ontario K9V 4S6
Phone: 705-328-6000
Fax: 705-328-6003
Address: Quinte Detention Centre
89 Richmond Blvd
Napanee Ontario K7R 3S1
Phone: 613 354 9701
Fax: 613 354 3944

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Nov 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Wesley Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Wesley (CPSO#: 68874 )
Business Address: Central East Correctional Centre
Ministry of Community Safety
and Correctional Services
541 Highway 36 P O Box 4500
Lindsay Ontario K9V 4S6
(705) 328-6000
Business Address: St. Joseph's Healthcare
Centre for Mountain Health Services
100 West 5th Street
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3K7
(905) 522-1155
Business Address: 4-181 Plains Rd W
4-181 Plains Rd W
Burlington ON L7T 0B1
9055256000

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEVEN JOHN WESLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WESLEY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEVEN JOHN WESLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WESLEY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 24 Jun 2002
Summary of Decision:
On June 24, 2002, the Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Steven John Wesley's admission and found that he engaged in sexual abuse of a patient (behaviour or remarks of a sexual nature by the member towards the patient) and disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct.

The Committee ordered and directed that:

1. Dr. Wesley attend before the panel to be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the register;
2. The Registrar impose the terms, conditions and limitations contained in an undertaking signed by Dr. Wesley, whose terms require, among other things, an apology to the complainant in writing, and that Dr. Wesley have a workplace monitor and a treating psychiatrist, both to report regularly to the Registrar;
3. Dr. Wesley have a third party in attendance at all times while seeing female patients;
4. Dr. Wesley post an irrevocable letter of credit, or other security, acceptable to the College, in the amount of $10,000.00 to reimburse the College for funding provided to the complainant under the programme required under section 85.7 of the Code;
5. Dr. Wesley pay $2,500.00 to the College toward the costs of the hearing; and
6. Any application Dr. Wesley may wish to bring in the future to vary the order be brought before a panel of the Discipline Committee as then constituted.

On December 2, 2008, the Discipline Committee, further to a motion by Dr. Wesley, varied the Order of June 24, 2002, and directed the removal of the terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Wesley's certificate of registration.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jun 24, 2002

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 24 Jun 2002
Summary of Decision:
On June 24, 2002, the Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Steven John Wesley's admission and found that he engaged in sexual abuse of a patient (behaviour or remarks of a sexual nature by the member towards the patient) and disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct.

The Committee ordered and directed that:

1. Dr. Wesley attend before the panel to be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the register;
2. The Registrar impose the terms, conditions and limitations contained in an undertaking signed by Dr. Wesley, whose terms require, among other things, an apology to the complainant in writing, and that Dr. Wesley have a workplace monitor and a treating psychiatrist, both to report regularly to the Registrar;
3. Dr. Wesley have a third party in attendance at all times while seeing female patients;
4. Dr. Wesley post an irrevocable letter of credit, or other security, acceptable to the College, in the amount of $10,000.00 to reimburse the College for funding provided to the complainant under the programme required under section 85.7 of the Code;
5. Dr. Wesley pay $2,500.00 to the College toward the costs of the hearing; and
6. Any application Dr. Wesley may wish to bring in the future to vary the order be brought before a panel of the Discipline Committee as then constituted.

On December 2, 2008, the Discipline Committee, further to a motion by Dr. Wesley, varied the Order of June 24, 2002, and directed the removal of the terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Wesley's certificate of registration.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jun 24, 2002

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee. Effective: 02 Dec 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Apr 2004
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 17 Dec 2003
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Mar 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Nov 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Dec 2008

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee.
Date: Effective: 02 Dec 2008

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jul 2004
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 23 Jul 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Apr 2004

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 17 Dec 2003

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2003

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2002
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Discipline Committee
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2002

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Mar 2001

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Nov 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995