THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 05:00:44 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1995
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 100
2525 Roseville Garden Drive
Windsor Ontario N8T 3J8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 945-4474
Fax: (519) 916-0214

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kiran Tatlay Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Feb 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Tatlay (CPSO#: 68877 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: Queen's University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 100
2525 Roseville Garden Drive
Windsor Ontario N8T 3J8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 945-4474
Fax: (519) 916-0214

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kiran Tatlay Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Feb 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Tatlay (CPSO#: 68877 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KIRAN DEEP KAUR TATLAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TATLAY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KIRAN DEEP KAUR TATLAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TATLAY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1997
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jul 1997

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1997

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995