THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 05:49:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Quinte Health Care - BGH
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville Ontario K8N 5A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 969-7400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Quinte Health Belleville
HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Andrew Samis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Feb 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Samis (CPSO#: 68880 )
Business Address: Quinte Health Care
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville Ontario K8N 5A9
(613) 384-0174
Business Address: Kingston General Hospital
Department of Surgery
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 384-0174

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Quinte Health Care - BGH
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville Ontario K8N 5A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 969-7400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2003
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Quinte Health Belleville
HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Andrew Samis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Feb 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Samis (CPSO#: 68880 )
Business Address: Quinte Health Care
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville Ontario K8N 5A9
(613) 384-0174
Business Address: Kingston General Hospital
Department of Surgery
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 384-0174

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREW JAMES WILLIS SAMIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAMIS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREW JAMES WILLIS SAMIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAMIS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Oct 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995