THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:05:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1995
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 710 Belmont Ave W
Kitchener ON N2M 1P2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5195762200
Fax: 5195765675

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Dec 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 03 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Grand River Hospital Corporation Freeport Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation Freeport Site
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: V. Bindlish Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Dec 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Bindlish (CPSO#: 68889 )
Business Address: Belmont Avenue West
Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener ONTARIO N2M 1P3
5195762200
Business Address: 710 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener ONTARIO N2M 1P3
5195762200
Business Address: 558 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener Ontario N2M 5E3
(519) 576-2200

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI
Medical School: McMaster University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 710 Belmont Ave W
Kitchener ON N2M 1P2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5195762200
Fax: 5195765675

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Dec 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 03 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Grand River Hospital Corporation Freeport Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation Freeport Site
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: V. Bindlish Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Dec 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Bindlish (CPSO#: 68889 )
Business Address: Belmont Avenue West
Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener ONTARIO N2M 1P3
5195762200
Business Address: 710 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener ONTARIO N2M 1P3
5195762200
Business Address: 558 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener Ontario N2M 5E3
(519) 576-2200

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VINITA BINDLISH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BINDLISH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VINITA BINDLISH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BINDLISH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995