THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:25:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1995
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4 Cataraqui St
Suite 103
Kingston ON K7K 1Z7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6135461600
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. Kilpatrick Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jan 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Kilpatrick (CPSO#: 68908 )
Business Address: 103-4 Cataraqui Street
Kingston Ontario K7K 1Z6

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4 Cataraqui St
Suite 103
Kingston ON K7K 1Z7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6135461600
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. Kilpatrick Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jan 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Kilpatrick (CPSO#: 68908 )
Business Address: 103-4 Cataraqui Street
Kingston Ontario K7K 1Z6

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KATHERINE LAUREL KILPATRICK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KILPATRICK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KATHERINE LAUREL KILPATRICK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KILPATRICK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1997
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1997

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995