THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 03:46:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 44890
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Other Health and Non-Health Professions

PROFESSION JURISDICTION
Dentistry Canada - Ontario
PROFESSION: Dentistry
JURISDICTION: Canada - Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Binh Khong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Oct 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Khong (CPSO#: 68909 )
Business Address: 9055212100
Business Address: 237 Barton St E
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
905-521-2100

Corporation Name: Dr. Binh Khong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 14 Dec 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 44890
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Other Health and Non-Health Professions

PROFESSION JURISDICTION
Dentistry Canada - Ontario
PROFESSION: Dentistry
JURISDICTION: Canada - Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Binh Khong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Oct 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Khong (CPSO#: 68909 )
Business Address: 9055212100
Business Address: 237 Barton St E
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
905-521-2100

Corporation Name: Dr. Binh Khong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 14 Dec 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BINH KIM KHONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHONG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BINH KIM KHONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHONG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 2001

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995