THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:24:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Gastro Health Clinic
Suite 250
4600 Highway 7
Woodbridge Ontario L4L 4Y7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 856-6797
Fax: (905) 856-6790
Address: William Osler Health Centre
Brampton Campus
2100 Bovaird Drive
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: William Osler Health Centre
Etobicoke Campus
101 Humber College Blvd
Toronto Ontario M9V 4B8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Vaughan Endoscopy Clinic
4610 Highway 7
Suite 200
Vaughan Ontario L4L 4Y7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Toronto Digestive Disease Associate
4600 Highway 7
Suite 225
Vaughan Ontario L4L 4Y7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 26 Sep 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Ford Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jun 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Ford (CPSO#: 68914 )
Business Address: Gastro Health Clinic
Unit 250
4600 Highway 7
Vaughan Ontario L4L 4Y7
(905) 856-6797
Business Address: Toronto Digestive Disease Associates
225 - 4600 Highway 7
Vaughan Ontario L4L 4Y7
(416) 650-0017
Business Address: William Olser Health Centre - Brampton Campus
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Business Address: Vaughan Endoscopy Clinic
200 - 4610 Highway 7
Vaughan Ontario L4L 4Y7
(905) 856-2626
Business Address: William Olser Health Centre - Etobicoke Campus
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 4B8
(416) 747-3500

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Gastro Health Clinic
Suite 250
4600 Highway 7
Woodbridge Ontario L4L 4Y7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 856-6797
Fax: (905) 856-6790
Address: William Osler Health Centre
Brampton Campus
2100 Bovaird Drive
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: William Osler Health Centre
Etobicoke Campus
101 Humber College Blvd
Toronto Ontario M9V 4B8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Vaughan Endoscopy Clinic
4610 Highway 7
Suite 200
Vaughan Ontario L4L 4Y7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Toronto Digestive Disease Associate
4600 Highway 7
Suite 225
Vaughan Ontario L4L 4Y7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 26 Sep 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Ford Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jun 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Ford (CPSO#: 68914 )
Business Address: Gastro Health Clinic
Unit 250
4600 Highway 7
Vaughan Ontario L4L 4Y7
(905) 856-6797
Business Address: Toronto Digestive Disease Associates
225 - 4600 Highway 7
Vaughan Ontario L4L 4Y7
(416) 650-0017
Business Address: William Olser Health Centre - Brampton Campus
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Business Address: Vaughan Endoscopy Clinic
200 - 4610 Highway 7
Vaughan Ontario L4L 4Y7
(905) 856-2626
Business Address: William Olser Health Centre - Etobicoke Campus
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 4B8
(416) 747-3500

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID CHARLES SEYMOUR FORD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FORD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID CHARLES SEYMOUR FORD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FORD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Mar 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Mar 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995