THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 03:30:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1995
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Room 3S-106
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 756-6444
Extension: 4477
Fax: (416) 342-1770

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 01 Nov 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 01 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Doctor Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Apr 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Doctor (CPSO#: 68918 )
Business Address: North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
(416) 756-6444 Extn: 4477

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Room 3S-106
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 756-6444
Extension: 4477
Fax: (416) 342-1770

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 01 Nov 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 01 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Doctor Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Apr 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Doctor (CPSO#: 68918 )
Business Address: North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
(416) 756-6444 Extn: 4477

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHAHEEN SAIFUDDIN DOCTOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOCTOR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHAHEEN SAIFUDDIN DOCTOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOCTOR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 May 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 May 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995