THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 04:16:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 189 Red River Road
Suite 401A
P7B6V4
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 807-343-7663
Fax: 807-343-7665
Address: Regional Health Sciences Centre
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
Phone: (809) 684-6000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: St. Joseph's Hospital
35 Algoma St. N.,
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 5G7
Phone: 807-343-2431
Extension: 2525
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Dec 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 11 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. F. Miller Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Miller (CPSO#: 68920 )
Business Address: 35 Algoma Street North
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 5G7
Business Address: 980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
(807) 684-7200
Business Address: 1530 Marlwood Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7G 1K1
807344-8690

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 189 Red River Road
Suite 401A
P7B6V4
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 807-343-7663
Fax: 807-343-7665
Address: Regional Health Sciences Centre
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
Phone: (809) 684-6000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: St. Joseph's Hospital
35 Algoma St. N.,
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 5G7
Phone: 807-343-2431
Extension: 2525
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Dec 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 11 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. F. Miller Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Miller (CPSO#: 68920 )
Business Address: 35 Algoma Street North
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 5G7
Business Address: 980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
(807) 684-7200
Business Address: 1530 Marlwood Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7G 1K1
807344-8690

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KEVIN FRANCIS MILLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILLER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KEVIN FRANCIS MILLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MILLER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1997
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jan 1998

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1997

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995