THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:31:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook & Women's College
Health Science Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
FG-62
North York Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-4208
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New Jersey

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Neal Westreich Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Feb 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Westreich (CPSO#: 68932 )
Business Address: Sunnybrook & Women's College
Health Sciences Centre
FG-60 - 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-4208

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW
Medical School: McMaster University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook & Women's College
Health Science Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
FG-62
North York Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-4208
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New Jersey

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Neal Westreich Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Feb 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Westreich (CPSO#: 68932 )
Business Address: Sunnybrook & Women's College
Health Sciences Centre
FG-60 - 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-4208

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NEAL MARK WESTREICH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WESTREICH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NEAL MARK WESTREICH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WESTREICH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995