THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:43:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 1995
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 908
4950 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M2N 6K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 644-0984
Fax: (416) 644-0985

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 11 Nov 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 11 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pedvis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jul 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Pedvis (CPSO#: 68960 )
Business Address: 908-4950 Yonge Street
Toronto ON M2N 6K1
416-644-0984

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 908
4950 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M2N 6K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 644-0984
Fax: (416) 644-0985

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 11 Nov 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 11 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pedvis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jul 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Pedvis (CPSO#: 68960 )
Business Address: 908-4950 Yonge Street
Toronto ON M2N 6K1
416-644-0984

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STACEY RHONDA PEDVIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PEDVIS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STACEY RHONDA PEDVIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PEDVIS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Feb 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Feb 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995