THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/05/25 05:25:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1995
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Golden Manor
481 Melrose Blvd
Timmins Ontario P4N 5H3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-360-2644
Fax: 705-264-3099
Address: Timmins and District Hospital
700 Ross Ave East
Timmins Ontario P4N 8P2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Julie Auger Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Feb 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Auger (CPSO#: 68985 )
Business Address: Golden Manor Nursing Home
481 Melrose Boulevard
Timmins Ontario P4N 5H3
(705) 360-2644 Extn: 4535
Business Address: Timmins and District Hospital
700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins Ontario P4N 8P2
(705) 360-2644 Extn: 4535

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Golden Manor
481 Melrose Blvd
Timmins Ontario P4N 5H3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-360-2644
Fax: 705-264-3099
Address: Timmins and District Hospital
700 Ross Ave East
Timmins Ontario P4N 8P2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Julie Auger Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Feb 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Auger (CPSO#: 68985 )
Business Address: Golden Manor Nursing Home
481 Melrose Boulevard
Timmins Ontario P4N 5H3
(705) 360-2644 Extn: 4535
Business Address: Timmins and District Hospital
700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins Ontario P4N 8P2
(705) 360-2644 Extn: 4535

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JULIE RACHEL AUGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AUGER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JULIE RACHEL AUGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AUGER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1997
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jun 1997

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995