THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 05:42:44 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Royal Victoria Hospital of Barrie
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 728-9090
Extension: 46611
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 201 Georgian Dr
RVH
Emergency Department
Barrie ON L4M 6M2
Phone: 7057289090
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 205-49 High Street
Barrie Ontario L4N 5J4
Phone: (705) 730-0286
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 370 Bayview Dr
Unit 118
Barrie ON L4N 7L3
Phone: 705 737 4733
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Dec 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andre B. May Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Jul 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. A. May (CPSO#: 68987 )
Business Address: Unit 2
279 Yonge Street
Barrie Ontario L4N 7T9
(705) 728-8860
Business Address: Royal Victoria Hospital of Barrie
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
(705) 728-9802
Business Address: 205 - 49 High Street
Barrie Ontario L4N 5J4
(705) 730-0286
Business Address: 102-480 Huronia Rd
Huronia Urgent Care Clinic
Barrie ON L4N 6M2
Business Address: 118-370 Bayview Dr
The Simcoe Clinic
Barrie ON L4N 7L3

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Royal Victoria Hospital of Barrie
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 728-9090
Extension: 46611
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 201 Georgian Dr
RVH
Emergency Department
Barrie ON L4M 6M2
Phone: 7057289090
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 205-49 High Street
Barrie Ontario L4N 5J4
Phone: (705) 730-0286
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 370 Bayview Dr
Unit 118
Barrie ON L4N 7L3
Phone: 705 737 4733
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Dec 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andre B. May Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Jul 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. A. May (CPSO#: 68987 )
Business Address: Unit 2
279 Yonge Street
Barrie Ontario L4N 7T9
(705) 728-8860
Business Address: Royal Victoria Hospital of Barrie
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
(705) 728-9802
Business Address: 205 - 49 High Street
Barrie Ontario L4N 5J4
(705) 730-0286
Business Address: 102-480 Huronia Rd
Huronia Urgent Care Clinic
Barrie ON L4N 6M2
Business Address: 118-370 Bayview Dr
The Simcoe Clinic
Barrie ON L4N 7L3

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDRE BOYD MAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDRE BOYD MAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 1997
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Oct 1997

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995