THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:13:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1385 Ontario Street
Burlington Ontario L7S 1G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 633-7862
Fax: (905) 633-8011
Address: Suite 207
3155 Harvester Road
Burlington Ontario L7N 3V2
Phone: (905) 631-2080
Fax: (905) 635-6215
Address: Joseph Brant Hospital
1245 Lakeshore Road
Burlington Ontario L7S 0A2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 26 Sep 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P. Kumaranayake Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Feb 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kumaranayake (CPSO#: 68991 )
Business Address: 1385 Ontario Street
Burlington Ontario L7S 1G2
(905) 633-7862

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1385 Ontario Street
Burlington Ontario L7S 1G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 633-7862
Fax: (905) 633-8011
Address: Suite 207
3155 Harvester Road
Burlington Ontario L7N 3V2
Phone: (905) 631-2080
Fax: (905) 635-6215
Address: Joseph Brant Hospital
1245 Lakeshore Road
Burlington Ontario L7S 0A2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 26 Sep 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P. Kumaranayake Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Feb 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kumaranayake (CPSO#: 68991 )
Business Address: 1385 Ontario Street
Burlington Ontario L7S 1G2
(905) 633-7862

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ARAVINDA PRASANNA KUMARANAYAKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUMARANAYAKE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ARAVINDA PRASANNA KUMARANAYAKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUMARANAYAKE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jul 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995