THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:35:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI, IRANIAN, PERSIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 237 Barton St E
Hamilton General Hospital
6 North, Room 607
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905)521-2100
Extension: 46320
Fax: (905)296-6433
Address: GHA Surgical Centre
726 Upper James Street
Hamilton Ontario L9C 2Z9
Phone: (905) 575-5743
Fax: (905) 575-7711

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 09 Mar 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 09 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Chedoke Hospital Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Chedoke Hospital Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kamyar Kahnamoui Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 May 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Kahnamoui (CPSO#: 69006 )
Business Address: 607 - 237 Barton Street East
6 North
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
(905) 527-4322 Extn: 46320

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI, IRANIAN, PERSIAN
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 237 Barton St E
Hamilton General Hospital
6 North, Room 607
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905)521-2100
Extension: 46320
Fax: (905)296-6433
Address: GHA Surgical Centre
726 Upper James Street
Hamilton Ontario L9C 2Z9
Phone: (905) 575-5743
Fax: (905) 575-7711

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 09 Mar 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 09 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Chedoke Hospital Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Chedoke Hospital Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kamyar Kahnamoui Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 May 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Kahnamoui (CPSO#: 69006 )
Business Address: 607 - 237 Barton Street East
6 North
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
(905) 527-4322 Extn: 46320

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAMYAR KAHNAMOUI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAHNAMOUI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAMYAR KAHNAMOUI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAHNAMOUI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995