THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 10:48:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Timmins & District Hospital
700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins Ontario P4N 8P2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 267-6340
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Dec 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Julie Samson & Dr. Trevor Harterre Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jun 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Harterre (CPSO#: 69010 ) Dr. J. Samson (CPSO#: 69016 )
Business Address: Suite 250
123 Third Avenue
Timmins Ontario P4N 1C6
(205) 264-1313

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Timmins & District Hospital
700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins Ontario P4N 8P2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 267-6340
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Dec 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
HOSPITAL: Timmins and District Hospital
LOCATION: Timmins

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Julie Samson & Dr. Trevor Harterre Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jun 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Harterre (CPSO#: 69010 ) Dr. J. Samson (CPSO#: 69016 )
Business Address: Suite 250
123 Third Avenue
Timmins Ontario P4N 1C6
(205) 264-1313

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TREVOR DONALD HARTERRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARTERRE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TREVOR DONALD HARTERRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARTERRE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 1997
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Oct 1997

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995