THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:15:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Dawson Road Family Medical Clinic
83 Dawson Road
Guelph Ontario N1H 1B1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 766-1360
Fax: (519) 766-0469

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Garry Wallace Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Wallace (CPSO#: 69013 )
Business Address: Dawson Road Family Medical Clinic
83 Dawson Road
Guelph Ontario N1H 1B1
(519) 766-1360

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Dawson Road Family Medical Clinic
83 Dawson Road
Guelph Ontario N1H 1B1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 766-1360
Fax: (519) 766-0469

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Garry Wallace Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Wallace (CPSO#: 69013 )
Business Address: Dawson Road Family Medical Clinic
83 Dawson Road
Guelph Ontario N1H 1B1
(519) 766-1360

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GARRY EDWARD WALLACE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALLACE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GARRY EDWARD WALLACE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALLACE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1997
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jun 1997

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995