THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 06:47:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: North Bay Regional Health Center
50 College Drive
P O Box 2500
North Bay Ontario P1B 0A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 474-8600
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 21 Nov 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 21 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sean Travers Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Feb 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Travers (CPSO#: 69014 )
Business Address: North Bay Regional Health Centre
50 College Drive
North Bay Ontario P1B 0A4
(705) 474-8600

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: North Bay Regional Health Center
50 College Drive
P O Box 2500
North Bay Ontario P1B 0A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 474-8600
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 21 Nov 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 21 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sean Travers Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Feb 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Travers (CPSO#: 69014 )
Business Address: North Bay Regional Health Centre
50 College Drive
North Bay Ontario P1B 0A4
(705) 474-8600

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SEAN ARTHUR TRAVERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRAVERS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SEAN ARTHUR TRAVERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRAVERS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Nov 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995