THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 03:16:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Odette Cancer Centre - Sunnybrook H
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-4951
Fax: (416) 480-6002
Address: 825 Coxwell Avenue
1235 Wilson Ave
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Radiation Oncology
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Radiation Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ian Poon and Dr. Shaneka Kulasingham Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Mar 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kulasingham (CPSO#: 69003 ) Dr. I. Poon (CPSO#: 69019 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Odette Cancer Centre - Sunnybrook H
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-4951
Fax: (416) 480-6002
Address: 825 Coxwell Avenue
1235 Wilson Ave
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Radiation Oncology
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Radiation Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ian Poon and Dr. Shaneka Kulasingham Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Mar 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kulasingham (CPSO#: 69003 ) Dr. I. Poon (CPSO#: 69019 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IAN DIN TSUN POON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IAN DIN TSUN POON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jul 2001

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995