THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:32:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Médecine et des Sciences de la Santé, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 210
820 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall Ontario K6H 4M4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 933-1441
Fax: (613) 933-1977

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Y. Ghantous Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Apr 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Ghantous (CPSO#: 69053 )
Business Address: Suite 210
820 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall Ontario K6H 4M4
(613) 933-1441

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC
Medical School: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Médecine et des Sciences de la Santé, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 210
820 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall Ontario K6H 4M4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 933-1441
Fax: (613) 933-1977

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Y. Ghantous Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Apr 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Ghantous (CPSO#: 69053 )
Business Address: Suite 210
820 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall Ontario K6H 4M4
(613) 933-1441

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YOUSSEF GHANTOUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHANTOUS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YOUSSEF GHANTOUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHANTOUS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Médecine et des Sciences de la Santé, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1997
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1997

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995