THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 13:19:04 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-813-1100
Fax: 905-813-4024
Address: Trillium Health Centre
Mississauga Site
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Phone: (416) 521-2110
Fax: (416) 521-2220

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 09 Sep 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 09 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Terry Kwan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Dec 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Kwan (CPSO#: 69061 )
Business Address: 100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B1
(905) 848-7100
Business Address: 150 Sherway Drive
Etobicoke Ontario M9C 1A4
(416) 521-2100
Business Address: 2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
905-813-1100

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-813-1100
Fax: 905-813-4024
Address: Trillium Health Centre
Mississauga Site
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Phone: (416) 521-2110
Fax: (416) 521-2220

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 09 Sep 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 09 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Terry Kwan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Dec 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Kwan (CPSO#: 69061 )
Business Address: 100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B1
(905) 848-7100
Business Address: 150 Sherway Drive
Etobicoke Ontario M9C 1A4
(416) 521-2100
Business Address: 2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
905-813-1100

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TERRY KWAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KWAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TERRY KWAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KWAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jul 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995