THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:51:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mackenzie Richmond Hill Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 883-2064
Fax: (905) 883-2065
Address: 3200 Major Mackenzie Dr
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
Maple ON L6A 4Z3
Phone: 905-417-2000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 07 Sep 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 07 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Danny K. Chen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Aug 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Chen (CPSO#: 69075 )
Business Address: Mackenzie Richmond Hill Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
(905) 883-2064

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE, MANDARIN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mackenzie Richmond Hill Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 883-2064
Fax: (905) 883-2065
Address: 3200 Major Mackenzie Dr
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
Maple ON L6A 4Z3
Phone: 905-417-2000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 07 Sep 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 07 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Danny K. Chen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Aug 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Chen (CPSO#: 69075 )
Business Address: Mackenzie Richmond Hill Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
(905) 883-2064

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANNY KUAN-I CHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANNY KUAN-I CHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jul 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995