THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 05:08:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 102
955 Major Mackenzie Drive
Vaughan Ontario L6A 4P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (289) 553-6336
Fax: (289) 553-6339

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. P. Chan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Feb 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Chan (CPSO#: 69076 )
Business Address: B02 - 250 Harding Boulevard West
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 9M7
(905) 737-0595
Business Address: 67 Blyth Hill Road
Toronto Ontario M4N 3L6
Business Address: 104 - 679 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 5G8
(905) 895-1313
Business Address: Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
(905) 895-4521
Business Address: Mackenzie Richmond Hill Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
(905) 883-1212
Business Address: 102 - 955 Major Mackenzie Drive
Vaughan Ontario L6A 4P9
(289) 553-6336
Business Address: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
(807) 684-6000
Business Address: 125 Pedersen Drive
Unit 3, 4, & 5
Aurora Ontario L4G 0E3

Corporation Name: Partap Law Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 09 Jul 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 102
955 Major Mackenzie Drive
Vaughan Ontario L6A 4P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (289) 553-6336
Fax: (289) 553-6339

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. P. Chan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Feb 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Chan (CPSO#: 69076 )
Business Address: B02 - 250 Harding Boulevard West
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 9M7
(905) 737-0595
Business Address: 67 Blyth Hill Road
Toronto Ontario M4N 3L6
Business Address: 104 - 679 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 5G8
(905) 895-1313
Business Address: Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
(905) 895-4521
Business Address: Mackenzie Richmond Hill Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
(905) 883-1212
Business Address: 102 - 955 Major Mackenzie Drive
Vaughan Ontario L6A 4P9
(289) 553-6336
Business Address: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
(807) 684-6000
Business Address: 125 Pedersen Drive
Unit 3, 4, & 5
Aurora Ontario L4G 0E3

Corporation Name: Partap Law Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 09 Jul 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAYMOND PAUL CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAYMOND PAUL CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995