THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:36:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 710
700 Dorval Drive
Oakville Ontario L6K 3V3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 599-0865
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 28 May 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 28 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jean-Wen Chan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Jun 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Chan (CPSO#: 69077 )
Business Address: Trillium Health Centre
Dept of Diagnostic Imaging
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
(905) 848-7529

Corporation Name: Magnuson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 May 2017

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 710
700 Dorval Drive
Oakville Ontario L6K 3V3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 599-0865
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 28 May 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 28 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jean-Wen Chan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Jun 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Chan (CPSO#: 69077 )
Business Address: Trillium Health Centre
Dept of Diagnostic Imaging
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
(905) 848-7529

Corporation Name: Magnuson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 May 2017

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEAN-WEN CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEAN-WEN CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Feb 2002

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995