THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 02:52:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Cancer Centre of
Southeastern Ontario
25 King Street West
Kingston Ontario K7L 5P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 544-2630
Extension: 4503
Fax: (613) 546-8201

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 12 Sep 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 12 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Providence Care Centre Kingston
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee
HOSPITAL: Providence Care Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

HOSPITAL: Lennox and Addington County General Hospital
LOCATION: Napanee

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: James Biagi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Jun 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Fuller (CPSO#: 54411 ) Dr. J. Biagi (CPSO#: 69087 )
Business Address: Cancer Centre of Southeastern Ontario
25 King Street West
Kingston Ontario K7L 5P9
(613) 544-2630 Extn: 4503

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Cancer Centre of
Southeastern Ontario
25 King Street West
Kingston Ontario K7L 5P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 544-2630
Extension: 4503
Fax: (613) 546-8201

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 12 Sep 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 12 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Providence Care Centre Kingston
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee
HOSPITAL: Providence Care Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

HOSPITAL: Lennox and Addington County General Hospital
LOCATION: Napanee

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: James Biagi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Jun 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Fuller (CPSO#: 54411 ) Dr. J. Biagi (CPSO#: 69087 )
Business Address: Cancer Centre of Southeastern Ontario
25 King Street West
Kingston Ontario K7L 5P9
(613) 544-2630 Extn: 4503

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAMES JOSEPH BIAGI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BIAGI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAMES JOSEPH BIAGI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BIAGI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Sep 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995