THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:22:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1065 Canadian Place
Unit #122-123
Mississauga Ontario L4W 0B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-626-2100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 715-115 humber College Blvd.
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 0A9
Phone: 416-749-9444
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Ontario Colonoscopy Clinics
715-115 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 0A9
Phone: 416-749-9444
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 08 Dec 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Dec 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 22 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lance A. Belchetz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Apr 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Belchetz (CPSO#: 69088 )
Business Address: 2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
(905) 813-4530

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1065 Canadian Place
Unit #122-123
Mississauga Ontario L4W 0B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-626-2100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 715-115 humber College Blvd.
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 0A9
Phone: 416-749-9444
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Ontario Colonoscopy Clinics
715-115 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke Ontario M9V 0A9
Phone: 416-749-9444
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 08 Dec 2000
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Dec 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 22 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lance A. Belchetz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Apr 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Belchetz (CPSO#: 69088 )
Business Address: 2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
(905) 813-4530

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LANCE ADAM BELCHETZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BELCHETZ is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LANCE ADAM BELCHETZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BELCHETZ is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 1997
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Dec 1997

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995