THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 03:33:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 160 Dundurn Street South
Hamilton Ontario L8P 4K3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 528-5480
Fax: (905) 528-2884

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hadcock Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Nov 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Hadcock (CPSO#: 69096 )
Business Address: 160 Dundurn Street South
Hamilton Ontario L8P 4K3
(905) 528-5480

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 160 Dundurn Street South
Hamilton Ontario L8P 4K3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 528-5480
Fax: (905) 528-2884

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hadcock Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Nov 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Hadcock (CPSO#: 69096 )
Business Address: 160 Dundurn Street South
Hamilton Ontario L8P 4K3
(905) 528-5480

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEVEN JOHN HADCOCK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HADCOCK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEVEN JOHN HADCOCK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HADCOCK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1997
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 1997

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995