THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 06:23:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4100 Baldwin St S
Whitby ON L1R 3H8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9054449493
Fax: 905-444-9174
Address: 701 Rossland Rd. E.
Unit #2
Whitby Ontario L1N 8Y9
Phone: 905-430-2112
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ken Daiter Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jul 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Daiter (CPSO#: 69114 )
Business Address: Whitby Medical
3910 Brock Street North
Unit 4
Whitby Ontario L1R 3E1
(905) 444-9493
Business Address: 701 Rossland Road East
#2
Whitby Ontario L1N 8Y9
(905) 430-2112
Business Address: 4100 Baldwin Street South
Whitby Ontario L1R 3H8
9054449493

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4100 Baldwin St S
Whitby ON L1R 3H8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9054449493
Fax: 905-444-9174
Address: 701 Rossland Rd. E.
Unit #2
Whitby Ontario L1N 8Y9
Phone: 905-430-2112
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ken Daiter Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jul 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Daiter (CPSO#: 69114 )
Business Address: Whitby Medical
3910 Brock Street North
Unit 4
Whitby Ontario L1R 3E1
(905) 444-9493
Business Address: 701 Rossland Road East
#2
Whitby Ontario L1N 8Y9
(905) 430-2112
Business Address: 4100 Baldwin Street South
Whitby Ontario L1R 3H8
9054449493

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KENNETH ALAN DAITER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAITER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KENNETH ALAN DAITER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAITER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1997
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 1997

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995