THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:47:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2200 Ww
222 King St E
Bowmanville Ontario L1C 1P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 697-3607
Fax: (905) 697-3645

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Dec 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 10 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Teofilo Corpus Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Mar 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Corpus (CPSO#: 69118 )
Business Address: 2200ww - 222 King Street East
Bowmanville Ontario L1C 1P6
(905) 697-3607

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2200 Ww
222 King St E
Bowmanville Ontario L1C 1P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 697-3607
Fax: (905) 697-3645

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Dec 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 10 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Teofilo Corpus Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Mar 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Corpus (CPSO#: 69118 )
Business Address: 2200ww - 222 King Street East
Bowmanville Ontario L1C 1P6
(905) 697-3607

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TEOFILO CORPUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CORPUS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TEOFILO CORPUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CORPUS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 1997
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jan 1998

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 1997

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995