THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:06:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 610 University Avenue
610 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4169462126
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Radiation Oncology
Effective: 04 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Radiation Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. Anne Koch Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Dec 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Koch (CPSO#: 69122 )
Business Address: University Health Network
Department of Radiation Oncology
5th Floor
610 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
(416) 946-2122

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 610 University Avenue
610 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4169462126
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Radiation Oncology
Effective: 04 Jun 2002
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Radiation Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. Anne Koch Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Dec 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Koch (CPSO#: 69122 )
Business Address: University Health Network
Department of Radiation Oncology
5th Floor
610 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
(416) 946-2122

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTINE ANNE KOCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOCH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTINE ANNE KOCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOCH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jul 2002

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995