THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 03:15:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 561 Eglinton Ave W
Toronto ON M5N 1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-551-7606
Fax: 647-689-2012

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 05 Sep 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 05 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Maryland
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrew Hyman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Mar 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hyman (CPSO#: 69130 )
Business Address: 561 Eglinton Ave W
Toronto ON M5N 1B5
416-551-7606

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 561 Eglinton Ave W
Toronto ON M5N 1B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-551-7606
Fax: 647-689-2012

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 05 Sep 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 05 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Maryland
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrew Hyman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Mar 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hyman (CPSO#: 69130 )
Business Address: 561 Eglinton Ave W
Toronto ON M5N 1B5
416-551-7606

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREW ROBERT HYMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HYMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREW ROBERT HYMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HYMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995