THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 04:57:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, GERMAN, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital
189 Elm Street
P O Box 2007
St Thomas Ontario N5P 3W2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 631-2020
Fax: (519) 631-1825

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Dec 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
HOSPITAL: St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital
LOCATION: St Thomas

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Hug Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Aug 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hug (CPSO#: 69131 )
Business Address: 189 Elm Street
St Thomas Ontario N5R 5C4
(519) 631-2020

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, GERMAN, SPANISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital
189 Elm Street
P O Box 2007
St Thomas Ontario N5P 3W2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 631-2020
Fax: (519) 631-1825

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Dec 2002
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 2002
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
HOSPITAL: St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital
LOCATION: St Thomas

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Hug Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Aug 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hug (CPSO#: 69131 )
Business Address: 189 Elm Street
St Thomas Ontario N5R 5C4
(519) 631-2020

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARTIN BERND HUG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARTIN BERND HUG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1997
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jul 1997

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1997

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995