THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:39:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 300 1
690 Dorval Drive
Oakville Ontario L6K 3W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 849-4567
Extension: 3
Fax: (905) 815-0299
Address: 3075 Hospital Gate
Suite 409
Oakville Ontario L6M 1M1
Phone: 905-849-4567
Fax: 905-815-0299

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 12 Sep 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 12 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Heffernan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Heffernan (CPSO#: 69137 )
Business Address: 690 Dorval Dr
Suite 300-1
Oakville ON L6K 3W7
905-849-4567

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 300 1
690 Dorval Drive
Oakville Ontario L6K 3W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 849-4567
Extension: 3
Fax: (905) 815-0299
Address: 3075 Hospital Gate
Suite 409
Oakville Ontario L6M 1M1
Phone: 905-849-4567
Fax: 905-815-0299

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 12 Sep 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 12 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Heffernan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Heffernan (CPSO#: 69137 )
Business Address: 690 Dorval Dr
Suite 300-1
Oakville ON L6K 3W7
905-849-4567

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL LAWRENCE HEFFERNAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEFFERNAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL LAWRENCE HEFFERNAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEFFERNAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995