THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:54:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 850 Wellington Road
St. Joseph's Health Care London
Parkwood Institute, Rm A2-129
PO Box 5777 Stn. B
London Ontario N6E 1L9
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: 5196466100
Extension: 42751
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 421 Greenbrook Drive
Kitchener Ontario N2M 4K1
Phone: (519) 578-3510
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 800 Commissioners Road East
London Health Sciences Centre Road E
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Phone: 5196466100
Extension: 42751
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 15 Sep 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 15 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: George A Heckman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Apr 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Heckman (CPSO#: 69138 )
Business Address: 886806 Twsp Rd 11
Bright ON N0J 1B0
5195048585
Business Address: 911 Queens Blvd
Kitchener ON N2M 1B2
5195048585
Business Address: 23B-421 Greenbrook Dr
Kitchener ON N2M 4K1
5195048585
Business Address: 250 Laurelwood Dr
Waterloo ON N2J 0E2
5195048585

Corporation Name: George A. Heckman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 850 Wellington Road
St. Joseph's Health Care London
Parkwood Institute, Rm A2-129
PO Box 5777 Stn. B
London Ontario N6E 1L9
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: 5196466100
Extension: 42751
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 421 Greenbrook Drive
Kitchener Ontario N2M 4K1
Phone: (519) 578-3510
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 800 Commissioners Road East
London Health Sciences Centre Road E
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Phone: 5196466100
Extension: 42751
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 15 Sep 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 15 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: George A Heckman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Apr 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Heckman (CPSO#: 69138 )
Business Address: 886806 Twsp Rd 11
Bright ON N0J 1B0
5195048585
Business Address: 911 Queens Blvd
Kitchener ON N2M 1B2
5195048585
Business Address: 23B-421 Greenbrook Dr
Kitchener ON N2M 4K1
5195048585
Business Address: 250 Laurelwood Dr
Waterloo ON N2J 0E2
5195048585

Corporation Name: George A. Heckman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GEORGE ALBERT WINSTON HECKMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HECKMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GEORGE ALBERT WINSTON HECKMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HECKMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995