THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:35:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Doctor's Lounge
Hotel Dieu Shaver Rehab. Hospital
541 Glenridge Ave.
St. Catharines Ontario L2T4C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 685-1381
Extension: 84261
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System - Welland Site Welland
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Welland Site
LOCATION: Welland

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. W. J. Reimer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Aug 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Reimer (CPSO#: 69145 )
Business Address: Hotel Dieu Shaver Health & Rehab Centre
541 Glendridge Avenue
St Catharines Ontario L2T 4C2
(905) 685-1381
Business Address: JBH - Hospitalist Office
1245 Lakeshore Road
Burlington Ontario L7S 0A2
(905) 632-3737 Extn: 2130

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Doctor's Lounge
Hotel Dieu Shaver Rehab. Hospital
541 Glenridge Ave.
St. Catharines Ontario L2T4C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 685-1381
Extension: 84261
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System - Welland Site Welland
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Welland Site
LOCATION: Welland

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. W. J. Reimer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Aug 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Reimer (CPSO#: 69145 )
Business Address: Hotel Dieu Shaver Health & Rehab Centre
541 Glendridge Avenue
St Catharines Ontario L2T 4C2
(905) 685-1381
Business Address: JBH - Hospitalist Office
1245 Lakeshore Road
Burlington Ontario L7S 0A2
(905) 632-3737 Extn: 2130

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WESLEY JAMES REIMER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REIMER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WESLEY JAMES REIMER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REIMER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1997
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jun 1997

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995