THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:48:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Anaesthesia
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 586-5270
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Kensington Eye Institute
340 College St. #600
Toronto Ontario M5T 3A9
Phone: 416 928 2132
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 31 May 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 31 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Peter Ho Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Ho (CPSO#: 69167 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Anaesthesia
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 586-5270
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Kensington Eye Institute
340 College St. #600
Toronto Ontario M5T 3A9
Phone: 416 928 2132
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 31 May 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 31 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Peter Ho Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Ho (CPSO#: 69167 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETER HIN TAT HO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETER HIN TAT HO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Dec 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 03 Aug 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2001
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jan 2003

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2002

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 03 Aug 2001

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Aug 2001
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 03 Aug 2001

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995