THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 04:49:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HAKKA, HINDI, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Taunton Health Centre
1290 Keith Ross Court
Oshawa Ontario L1J 0C7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 723-8551
Extension: 5402
Fax: (905) 721-6682

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chien Chuang Li Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Nov 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Li (CPSO#: 69174 )
Business Address: 117 King Street East
Oshawa Ontario L1H 1B9
(905) 723-8551
Business Address: Taunton Health Centre
1290 Keith Ross Court
Oshawa Ontario L1H 7K4
(905) 723-8551
Business Address: 1450 Highway 2
Courtice Ontario L1E 3C3
(905) 723-8551

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HAKKA, HINDI, MANDARIN
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Taunton Health Centre
1290 Keith Ross Court
Oshawa Ontario L1J 0C7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 723-8551
Extension: 5402
Fax: (905) 721-6682

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chien Chuang Li Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Nov 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Li (CPSO#: 69174 )
Business Address: 117 King Street East
Oshawa Ontario L1H 1B9
(905) 723-8551
Business Address: Taunton Health Centre
1290 Keith Ross Court
Oshawa Ontario L1H 7K4
(905) 723-8551
Business Address: 1450 Highway 2
Courtice Ontario L1E 3C3
(905) 723-8551

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHIEN CHUANG LI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHIEN CHUANG LI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 18 Feb 2016
Summary:
Effective August 4, 2017, Dr. Li has completed all elements of this SCERP.
 
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 18 Feb 2016
Summary:
Effective August 4, 2017, Dr. Li has completed all elements of this SCERP.
 
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1997
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jul 1997

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1997

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995