THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 04:32:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicine, 1984
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-2575 Innes Rd
Gloucester ON K1B 3K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613 596 6006
Fax: 613 596 3954

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Esther Soccar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Sep 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Soccar (CPSO#: 69177 )
Business Address: Suite 102
3029 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K2B 8E8
(613) 596-6006
Business Address: 2575 Innes Rd
Gloucester ON K1B 3K1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicine, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-2575 Innes Rd
Gloucester ON K1B 3K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613 596 6006
Fax: 613 596 3954

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Esther Soccar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Sep 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Soccar (CPSO#: 69177 )
Business Address: Suite 102
3029 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K2B 8E8
(613) 596-6006
Business Address: 2575 Innes Rd
Gloucester ON K1B 3K1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ESTHER ARMYA MANSOUR SOCCAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOCCAR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ESTHER ARMYA MANSOUR SOCCAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOCCAR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicine, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1997
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 1997

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995