THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:24:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Uptown Health Centre
Unit 8
9325 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 0A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 508-8876
Fax: (905) 508-1087
Address: 243 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M4R 1B1
Phone: (416) 489-2106
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anu Kaushal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Apr 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kaushal (CPSO#: 69178 )
Business Address: 243 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M4R 1B1
(416) 931-2681
Business Address: Uptown Health Centre
8 - 9325 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 0A8
(905) 508-8876

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Uptown Health Centre
Unit 8
9325 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 0A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 508-8876
Fax: (905) 508-1087
Address: 243 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M4R 1B1
Phone: (416) 489-2106
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anu Kaushal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Apr 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kaushal (CPSO#: 69178 )
Business Address: 243 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M4R 1B1
(416) 931-2681
Business Address: Uptown Health Centre
8 - 9325 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 0A8
(905) 508-8876

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANU KAUSHAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAUSHAL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANU KAUSHAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAUSHAL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1997
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1997

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995