THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 05:38:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 2 - 240 Shepherdson Rd
New Liskeard Ontario P0J 1P0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 647-6100
Fax: 705-647-0173
Address: Timiskaming Health Unit
43-247 Whitewood Ave
New Liskeard Ontario P0J 1P0
Phone: (705) 647-4305
Fax: (705) 647-5779

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Temiskaming Hospital New Liskeard
HOSPITAL: Temiskaming Hospital
LOCATION: New Liskeard

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G. Corneil Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Corneil (CPSO#: 69182 )
Business Address: 240 Shepherdson Road
New Liskeard Ontario P0J 1P0
(705) 647-6100

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 2 - 240 Shepherdson Rd
New Liskeard Ontario P0J 1P0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 647-6100
Fax: 705-647-0173
Address: Timiskaming Health Unit
43-247 Whitewood Ave
New Liskeard Ontario P0J 1P0
Phone: (705) 647-4305
Fax: (705) 647-5779

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Temiskaming Hospital New Liskeard
HOSPITAL: Temiskaming Hospital
LOCATION: New Liskeard

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G. Corneil Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Corneil (CPSO#: 69182 )
Business Address: 240 Shepherdson Road
New Liskeard Ontario P0J 1P0
(705) 647-6100

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GLENN GORDON CORNEIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CORNEIL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GLENN GORDON CORNEIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CORNEIL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1997
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jun 1997

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995