THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:51:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 109
2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2V8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 607-6398
Fax: (905) 607-8293

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ayyan Niaz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Sep 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Niaz (CPSO#: 69194 )
Business Address: Suite 109
2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2V8
(905) 607-6398

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 109
2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2V8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 607-6398
Fax: (905) 607-8293

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ayyan Niaz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Sep 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Niaz (CPSO#: 69194 )
Business Address: Suite 109
2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2V8
(905) 607-6398

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AYYAN NIAZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NIAZ is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AYYAN NIAZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NIAZ is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Nov 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 May 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Nov 2007

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Aug 2007
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Executive Committee
Date: Effective: 24 Aug 2007

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 May 2001

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995