THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:49:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GREEK

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Scarborough General Hospital
Medical Mall
3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Suite 316
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2T7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 439-8897
Fax: (416) 439-6128
Address: 804-240 Duncan Mill Rd
North York ON M3B 3S6
Phone: 4163915778
Fax: 4163915779
Address: 830 Dixon Road
Toronto Ontario M9W 5Z5
Phone: 416575972
Fax: 4`165725982
Address: Crescent Town Specialty Clinic
4 The Market Place, Crescent Town
Toronto Ontario M4C 5M1
Phone: (416) 690-1357
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nick Frank Logarakis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Nov 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Logarakis (CPSO#: 69214 )
Business Address: Scarborough General Hospital
Medical Mall
Suite 316
3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2T7
(416) 439-8897

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GREEK
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Scarborough General Hospital
Medical Mall
3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Suite 316
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2T7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 439-8897
Fax: (416) 439-6128
Address: 804-240 Duncan Mill Rd
North York ON M3B 3S6
Phone: 4163915778
Fax: 4163915779
Address: 830 Dixon Road
Toronto Ontario M9W 5Z5
Phone: 416575972
Fax: 4`165725982
Address: Crescent Town Specialty Clinic
4 The Market Place, Crescent Town
Toronto Ontario M4C 5M1
Phone: (416) 690-1357
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2000
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nick Frank Logarakis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Nov 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Logarakis (CPSO#: 69214 )
Business Address: Scarborough General Hospital
Medical Mall
Suite 316
3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2T7
(416) 439-8897

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NICK FRANK LOGARAKIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOGARAKIS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NICK FRANK LOGARAKIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOGARAKIS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995