THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 06:13:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Staff Radiologist
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia Ontario L3V 2Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 325-2201
Extension: 3077
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Alliston Medical Imaging
Unit 21-23
117 Yonge Street
Alliston Ontario L9R 1V2
Phone: (705) 434-0074
Fax: (705) 434-9074
Address: unit 59e-1299 Oxford Street East
1299 Oxford St E Unit 59E, , ON N5Y 4W5
London Ontario N5Y 4W5
Phone: (519) 204-6204
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Consultant Radiologist
Canadian Vascular Lab/ Bayview Diag
Suite 300
535 Mulock Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 5H2
Phone: (905) 953-9044
Fax: No Information Available
Address: York Ultrasound
219 Sheppard Avenue West
North York Ontario M2N 1N2
Phone: (416) 913-4228
Fax: (416) 915-9009

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D'Arcy Little Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Little (CPSO#: 69217 )
Business Address: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia Ontario L3V 2Z3
(705) 325-2201
Business Address: Canadian Vascular Laboratories
Suite 100
16700 Bayview Avenue
Newmarket Ontario L3X 1W1
(905) 953-9044
Business Address: PACE Medical Imaging
117 Young Street
Suite 21-23
Alliston Ontario L9R 1V2
(705) 434-0074
Business Address: York Ultrasound
219 Sheppard Avenue West
North York Ontario M2N 1N2
(416) 913-4228
Business Address: Lawrence X-Ray and Ultrasound
1A-3585 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1G 1P4
(416) 431-1889
Business Address: Toronto east X-Ray & Ultrasound
1145 Monringside Avenue
Scarborough Ontario M1B 0A7
(647) 350-0401

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Staff Radiologist
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia Ontario L3V 2Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 325-2201
Extension: 3077
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Alliston Medical Imaging
Unit 21-23
117 Yonge Street
Alliston Ontario L9R 1V2
Phone: (705) 434-0074
Fax: (705) 434-9074
Address: unit 59e-1299 Oxford Street East
1299 Oxford St E Unit 59E, , ON N5Y 4W5
London Ontario N5Y 4W5
Phone: (519) 204-6204
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Consultant Radiologist
Canadian Vascular Lab/ Bayview Diag
Suite 300
535 Mulock Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 5H2
Phone: (905) 953-9044
Fax: No Information Available
Address: York Ultrasound
219 Sheppard Avenue West
North York Ontario M2N 1N2
Phone: (416) 913-4228
Fax: (416) 915-9009

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D'Arcy Little Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Little (CPSO#: 69217 )
Business Address: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia Ontario L3V 2Z3
(705) 325-2201
Business Address: Canadian Vascular Laboratories
Suite 100
16700 Bayview Avenue
Newmarket Ontario L3X 1W1
(905) 953-9044
Business Address: PACE Medical Imaging
117 Young Street
Suite 21-23
Alliston Ontario L9R 1V2
(705) 434-0074
Business Address: York Ultrasound
219 Sheppard Avenue West
North York Ontario M2N 1N2
(416) 913-4228
Business Address: Lawrence X-Ray and Ultrasound
1A-3585 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1G 1P4
(416) 431-1889
Business Address: Toronto east X-Ray & Ultrasound
1145 Monringside Avenue
Scarborough Ontario M1B 0A7
(647) 350-0401

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. D'ARCY LAWRENCE LITTLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LITTLE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. D'ARCY LAWRENCE LITTLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LITTLE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jun 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995