THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:43:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 202 - 68 Centennial Pkwy S
Stoney Creek Ontario L8G 2C5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 662-1234
Fax: (905) 662-9422

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
FCFP - Family Medicine
Effective: 29 Nov 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 09 Oct 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: FCFP - Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 29 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 09 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Haldimand War Memorial Hospital Dunnville
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Haldimand War Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Dunnville

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Grimsby

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Schweitzer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jan 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Schweitzer (CPSO#: 69238 )
Business Address: 68 Centennial Parkway South
Suite 202
Stoney Creek Ontario L8G 2C5
(905) 662-1234

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 202 - 68 Centennial Pkwy S
Stoney Creek Ontario L8G 2C5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 662-1234
Fax: (905) 662-9422

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
FCFP - Family Medicine
Effective: 29 Nov 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 09 Oct 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 1997
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: FCFP - Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 29 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 09 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Haldimand War Memorial Hospital Dunnville
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Haldimand War Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Dunnville

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Grimsby

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Schweitzer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jan 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Schweitzer (CPSO#: 69238 )
Business Address: 68 Centennial Parkway South
Suite 202
Stoney Creek Ontario L8G 2C5
(905) 662-1234

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL JOSEPH SCHWEITZER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHWEITZER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL JOSEPH SCHWEITZER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHWEITZER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1997
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jun 1997

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995