THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:38:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, DUTCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
DSO, OPG Wing, 6th Floor
610 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 946-4432
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 12 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Reedijk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Reedijk (CPSO#: 69241 )
Business Address: Princess Margaret Hospital
Room 3-130
610 University Aveue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
(416) 946-4432

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, DUTCH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
DSO, OPG Wing, 6th Floor
610 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 946-4432
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 12 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Reedijk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Reedijk (CPSO#: 69241 )
Business Address: Princess Margaret Hospital
Room 3-130
610 University Aveue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
(416) 946-4432

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL JAN REEDIJK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REEDIJK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL JAN REEDIJK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REEDIJK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 27 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 05 Nov 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 04 Nov 2000
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2001

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2001

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Nov 2000
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 05 Nov 2000

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 04 Nov 2000

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995