THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 04:51:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: University Health Network
Toronto General Hospital
150 Gerrard Street West
P M C C 3-526b
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-4442
Fax: (416) 340-4457
Address: IHealth center
6175 hwy 7
vaughnl4h 0p6
Vaughan Ontario M4C 5M1
Phone: 4162978362
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 11 Sep 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 11 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. Nanthakumar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jan 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Nanthakumar (CPSO#: 69243 )
Business Address: 6175 Highway 7
Vaughan Ontario L4H 0P6
Business Address: University Health Network
Toronto General Hospital
150 Gerrard Street West
PMCC 3-526b
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
(416) 340-4442

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: University Health Network
Toronto General Hospital
150 Gerrard Street West
P M C C 3-526b
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-4442
Fax: (416) 340-4457
Address: IHealth center
6175 hwy 7
vaughnl4h 0p6
Vaughan Ontario M4C 5M1
Phone: 4162978362
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 11 Sep 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 11 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. Nanthakumar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jan 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Nanthakumar (CPSO#: 69243 )
Business Address: 6175 Highway 7
Vaughan Ontario L4H 0P6
Business Address: University Health Network
Toronto General Hospital
150 Gerrard Street West
PMCC 3-526b
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
(416) 340-4442

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KUMARASWAMY NANTHAKUMAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NANTHAKUMAR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KUMARASWAMY NANTHAKUMAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NANTHAKUMAR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1999

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1995